EP0313512 - Benzothiadiazoles and their use in processes and compositions against plant diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schurter, Rolf, Dr. Holzmattstrasse 45 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | 02 /
Kunz, Walter, Dr. Buchenstrasse 9 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 03 /
Nyfeler, Robert, Dr. Bärenfelserstrasse 8 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [1989/17] | Application number, filing date | 88810561.6 | 17.08.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | CH19870003229 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: CH 322987 | [1989/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313512 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313512 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313512 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/82, C07D285/14, C07F7/08, C07F9/6518, C07D417/12, C07H13/08 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
C07D285/14 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1989/17] | A01N43/82, C07D285/14, C07F7/08, C07F9/32, C07D417/12, C07H13/08, C07C149/43 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Benzothiadiazole und ihre Verwendung in Verfahren und Mitteln gegen Pflanzenkrankheiten | [1989/17] | English: | Benzothiadiazoles and their use in processes and compositions against plant diseases | [1989/17] | French: | Benzothiadiazoles et leur utilisation dans des procédés et des compositions contre les maladies végétales | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 08.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE1695786 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [A]US4177054 (ARNDT FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) | [XD] - Journal of the Chemical Society (C), 1971, Seiten 3994-3999, London, GB; E. HADDOCK et al.: "1,2,3-benzothiadiazoles. Part V. The rearrangement of diazonium salts derived from 7-aminobenzisothiazoles". |