EP0317505 - Azacycloalkylalkandiphosphonic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaeggi, Knut A., Dr. General Guisan-Strasse 44 CH-4054 Basel / CH | [1989/21] | Application number, filing date | 88810751.3 | 03.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | CH19870004435 | 13.11.1987 Original published format: CH 443587 | [1989/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317505 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/65, A61K31/675 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
C07F9/5535 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07F9/5765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Neue Azacycloalkylalkandiphosphonsäuren | [1989/21] | English: | Azacycloalkylalkandiphosphonic acids | [1989/21] | French: | Acides azacycloalkylalcanediphosphoniques | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0170228 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [YP]EP0272208 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |