EP0302839 - Wooden strip for floors and panelling made up of a combination of wooden elements with their fibres at right-angles and elements with their fibres parallel with respect to the visible face [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIAROM s.r.l. Viale Roma 23 I-06100 Perugia / IT | [1989/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Margaritelli, Giuseppe Viale Roma I-06100 Perugia / IT | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 I-60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 88830327.8 | 26.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | IT19870000571U | 31.07.1987 Original published format: IT 57187 U | [1989/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302839 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302839 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/10, E04F15/04, B32B21/13 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
B27M3/04 (EP);
B27L5/00 (EP);
E04C2/12 (EP);
E04F13/10 (EP);
E04F15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Holzstreifen für Böden und Paneele aus Holzelementen, deren Fasern senkrecht sind und Elemente, deren Fasern parallel zur sichtbaren Schicht sind | [1989/06] | English: | Wooden strip for floors and panelling made up of a combination of wooden elements with their fibres at right-angles and elements with their fibres parallel with respect to the visible face | [1989/06] | French: | Panneau de bois pour plancher et lambrissage contenant des éléments de bois dont les fibres sont perpendiculaires, et des éléments dont les fibres sont parallèles par rapport à la couche visible | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE361930 ; | [X]GB361482 ; | [X]CH263088 ; | [A]DE3200653 ; | [A]DE2922046 ; | [AP]EP0236283 |