EP0310578 - Tear-open container, in particular for waterice or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Via Rettifilo al Bravo 84 I-80022 Arzano NA / IT | [1989/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Amato, Antonio 3 Via Lomonaco I-80121 Napoli NA / IT | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Tonon, Gilberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Tonon, Gilberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 88830399.7 | 03.10.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | IT19870036042U | 01.10.1987 Original published format: IT 3604287 U | [1989/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310578 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310578 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/00, B65D3/06, B65D85/78 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
B65D85/78 (EP);
B65D3/06 (EP);
B65D5/008 (EP);
B65D5/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Aufreissbarer Behälter, insbesondere für Wassereis oder dergleichen | [1989/14] | English: | Tear-open container, in particular for waterice or the like | [1989/14] | French: | Récipient à ouvrir en déchirant, en particulier pour sorbet ou de produits similaires | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.05.1992 | LI | 06.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE487406 ; | [A]GB463205 (TECALEMIT LTD); | [Y]US2344359 (HARRY LEHMANN); | [A]US3851813 (SMITH E); | [Y]US4657142 (MIZOGUCHI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) |