EP0320460 - Process for isolating the enzyme carnitinehydrolyase from strains belonging to the family enterobacteriaceae and use of the immobilized enzyme for producing L(-)-carnitine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 00144 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 I-00144 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Heinrich, Dr. Erich-Weinert-Ring 18 DDR-4440 Wolfen / DD | 02 /
Jung, Kirsten, Dr. Erich-Weinert-Ring 18 DDR-4440 Wolfen / DD | 03 /
Kleber, Hans-Peter, Prof. Dr. Sc. Max-Planck-Strasse 7 DDR-7010 Leipzig / DD | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Fassi, Aldo c/o Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Via Pontina, Km. 30, 400 00040 Pomezia (Roma) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Fassi, Aldo, Dr. c/o Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Via Pontina, Km. 30, 400 I-00040 Pomezia (Roma) / IT | Application number, filing date | 88830425.0 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DD19420003082 | 26.10.1987 Original published format: DD 308242 | DD19430003082 | 26.10.1987 Original published format: DD 308243 | [1989/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320460 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320460 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320460 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/00, C12N11/08, // (C12P13/00, C12N9:88) | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C12P13/007 (EP,US);
C12N11/10 (EP,US);
C12N11/14 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Isolierung des Enzyms Karnitin-Hydrolyase von zur Familie der Enterobakteriaceae gehörenden Stämmen und Verwendung des immobilisierten Enzyms zur Herstellung von L(-)Karnitin | [1989/24] | English: | Process for isolating the enzyme carnitinehydrolyase from strains belonging to the family enterobacteriaceae and use of the immobilized enzyme for producing L(-)-carnitine | [1989/24] | French: | Procédé pour isoler l'enzyme carnitine hydrolyase à partir de souches appartenant à la familles des entérobactériaceae et utilisation de l'enzyme immobilisée pour produire la L(-)-carnitine | [1989/24] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.1994 | GR | 27.04.1994 | GB | 19.10.1994 | ES | 20.10.1994 | SE | 20.10.1994 | BE | 31.10.1994 | CH | 31.10.1994 | LI | 31.10.1994 | LU | 31.10.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.04.1994 | |
GR | 27.04.1994 | ||
GB | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
BE | 31.10.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
LU | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 27.04.1994 | |
GB | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
BE | 31.10.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 27.04.1994 | |
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
BE | 31.10.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 27.04.1994 | |
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 27.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6167494 ; | [YD]EP0148132 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 15, October 1986, page 525, abstract no. 132142u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-61 67 494 (SEITETSU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD) 07-04-1986, & JP6167494 A 00000000 |