EP0323412 - An ignition system for an internal combustion engine for motor vehicles, particularly of the static-distribution type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARELLI AUTRONICA S.p.A. Piazza Sant'Ambrogio, 6 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states MARELLI AUTRONICA S.p.A. Piazza Sant'Ambrogio, 6 I-20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciliberto, Giuseppe Via Lancia 138/10 I-10141 Torino / IT | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88830500.0 | 22.11.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | IT19870068139 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: IT 6813987 | [1989/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323412 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323412 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/045, F02P7/03 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
F02P3/0453 (EP);
F02P7/03 (EP);
F02P9/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | F02P7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Zündungsystem für innere Brennkraftmaschinen von Fahrzeugen, insbesondere vom statischen Verteilertyp | [1989/27] | English: | An ignition system for an internal combustion engine for motor vehicles, particularly of the static-distribution type | [1989/27] | French: | Système d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne automobile, en particulier du type à distribution statique | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/24] | 15.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3905347 (LAPEYRONNIE ANDRE GABRIEL); | [A]US3940658 (ALLRED MICHAEL V); | [Y]US4290406 (IYODA MICHIO, et al); | [A]GB2099252 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]FR2552602 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) |