EP0284578 - A printhead with moving mechanism for print elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/39] | Method of moving print elements in printheads and a printhead with moving mechanism for print elements | ||
[1992/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACIT AKTIEBOLAG S-172 91 Sundbyberg / SE | [1988/47] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stenudd, Sven Gunnar Valter Lojovägen 64, 1 tr S-181 47 Lidingö / SE | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Karlström, Lennart AB Stockholms Patentbyrå Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Karlström, Lennart AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/47] | Onn, Thorsten AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/39] | Onn, Thorsten AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850077.4 | 03.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | SE19870001287 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: SE 8701287 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284578 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284578 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/28, B41J9/36 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
B41J2/28 (EP,US);
B41J9/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/39] | B41J7/84, B41J3/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/39] | Title | German: | Druckkopf mit Bewegungsmechanismus für Druckelemente | [1992/01] | English: | A printhead with moving mechanism for print elements | [1992/01] | French: | Une tête d'impression avec un mécanisme de mouvement pour éléments d'impression | [1992/01] |
Former [1988/39] | Verfahren zur Bewegung von Druckelementen in einem Druckkopf und Druckkopf mit Bewegungsmechanismus für Druckelemente | ||
Former [1988/39] | Method of moving print elements in printheads and a printhead with moving mechanism for print elements | ||
Former [1988/39] | Procédé pour le mouvement d'éléments d'impression dans une tête d'impression et une tête d'impression avec un mécanisme de mouvement pour éléments d'impression | Examination procedure | 22.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0120703 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]US3878778 (GOMI YOSHIFUMI); | [A]US4584937 (BRINGHURST EDWARD D [US]) |