EP0287545 - A roll holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metsä-Serla Oy Fabianinkatu 8 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states Metsä-Serla Oy Fabianinkatu 8 A SF-00130 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states HOLMENS BRUK AKTIEBOLAG S-601 88 Norrköpping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jernberg, Marita Dalripevägen 1 S-542 00 Mariestad / SE | 02 /
Käll, Mikael Marieholmsvägen 33 S-542 00 Mariestad / SE | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Norin, Klas Kooperativa förbundet Patent Department P.O. Box 15200 S-104 65 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/42] | Erixon, Bo Kooperativa Förbundet (KF) Patent Department Box 15200 S-104 65 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850130.1 | 14.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | SE19870001633 | 16.04.1987 Original published format: SE 8701633 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0287545 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287545 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/38 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
A47K10/3818 (EP,US);
A47K10/38 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3863 (EP,US);
Y10T225/246 (EP,US);
Y10T225/252 (EP,US);
Y10T225/287 (EP,US);
Y10T225/393 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | Rollenhalter | [1988/42] | English: | A roll holder | [1988/42] | French: | Support pour rouleau | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 19.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.11.1993 | GR | 18.11.1993 | IT | 18.11.1993 | NL | 18.11.1993 | SE | 18.11.1993 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 18.11.1993 | |
GR | 18.11.1993 | ||
IT | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 18.11.1993 | |
IT | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 18.11.1993 | |
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 18.11.1993 | |
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1676854 (CASTERLINE EDWIN D); | [X]US2589587 (WEAKLEND STEPHEN E, et al); | [A]FR1004127 ; | [A]US2978156 (YANIELLO INDUSTRIAL J); | [A]US3145940 (HENRY ALVAN R); | [A]US3713569 (DASHNIER M, et al); | [A]US3918661 (KISHI EMITSU, et al); | [A]US4398656 (MCCADDEN WALTER E [US]) |