EP0372148 - Lung exercising device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norell, Erik Folke Vävaregatan 5 B S-531 34 Lidköping / SE | [1990/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 S-115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850416.4 | 09.12.1988 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0372148 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/18 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A63B23/18 (EP,US);
A61M16/049 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0027 (EP,US);
A63B2208/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Übung der Lunge | [1990/24] | English: | Lung exercising device | [1990/24] | French: | Dispositif pour exercices respiratoires | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/28] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4770413 (GREEN MICHAEL J [US]); | [Y]US4025070 (MCGILL LEE E, et al); | [Y]US4291704 (PETTY THOMAS L, et al); | [A]CH388713 (JACOBSEN ROLF [NO]); | [A]GB933234 (VOITH GMBH J M); | [A]US4739987 (NICHOLSON MARGUERITE K [US]); | [A]US4221381 (ERICSON RICHARD E); | [Y]CH88064 (OTTO SCHAER DR MED [CH]); | [Y]GB2007100 (FERRARIS DEV & ENG CO LTD); | [A]FR2369822 (BARD INC C R [US]) |