EP0321429 - Emulsion for parenteral administration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states KABIVITRUM AB S-112 87 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wretlind, Karl Arvid Johannes Floragatan 2 S-114 31 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Ajaxon, Bengt Magnus Hävelvägen 7 S-756 47 Uppsala / SE | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850423.0 | 14.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | SE19870005064 | 18.12.1987 Original published format: SE 8705064 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321429 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/23, A61K9/10, A61K49/00 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/0029 (EP);
A61K31/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1989/25] | Title | German: | Emulsion zur parenteralen Administration | [1989/25] | English: | Emulsion for parenteral administration | [1989/25] | French: | Emulsion administrable par voie parentérale | [1989/25] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/49: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89900673.8/0353267 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 17.10.91 | EPB 1991/49: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89900673.8/0353267 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 17.10.91 | EPB 1991/49: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89900673.8/0353267 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 17.10.91 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 07.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP60237017 [ ]; | US3158541 [ ] (SUTHERLAND LESLIE H); | US3198704 [ ] (NATH ROY KRISHNABANDHU); | DE3409793 [ ] (TERUMO CORP [JP]); | FR2553661 [ ] (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]); | EP0145873 [ ] (TERUMO CORP [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 10, No. 107 (C-341) & JP-A-60-237017 (Nihon Keikinzoku KK) 25-11-1985, & JP60237017 A 00000000 |