EP0293357 - Expression of human proapolipoprotein A-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U C B, S.A. 326, Avenue Louise, Bte 7 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states U C B, S.A. 326, Avenue Louise, Bte 7 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bollen, Alex 65, Gaasbeekstraat B-1711 Itterbeek / BE | 02 /
Gobert, Jean 120, rue du Cornet B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
Wülfert, Ernst 52, Avenue des Aubépines B-1180 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Raymond, et al UCB S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Dusseldorp, Raymond, et al UCB S.A. Département D.T.B. 33, rue d'Anderlecht B-1620 Drogenbos / BE | Application number, filing date | 88870095.2 | 24.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | GB19870012540 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712540 | [1988/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293357 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293357 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/00 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12P21/02 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/48] | C12N15/00, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Expression von menschlichem Proapolipoprotein A-1 | [1988/48] | English: | Expression of human proapolipoprotein A-1 | [1988/48] | French: | Expression de la proapolipoprotéine A-I humaine | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8605810 (BIOGEN NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0267703 (ERBA FARMITALIA [IT]) | [YD] - FEBS LETTERS, vol. 194, no. 2, janvier 1986, pages 343-346, Federation of European Biochemical Societies; R. LORENZETTI et al.: "Expression of the human apolipoprotein AI gene fused to the E. coli gene for beta-galactosidase" | [A] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 13, no. 6, mars 1985, pages 1923-1938, IRL Press Ltd, GB; G. BUELL et al.: "Optimizing the expression in E. coli of a synthetic gene encoding somatomedin-C (IGF-I)" |