EP0298950 - Railway frog [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voest-Alpine Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. Lunzerstrasse 64 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1989/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pirker, Robert Marhaltstrasse 26 A-8740 Zeltweg / AT | 02 /
Rotter, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Bessemerstrasse 22 A-8740 Zeltweg / AT | 03 /
Blumauer, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bessemerstrasse 20 A-8740 Zeltweg / AT | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M., et al Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr., et al Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 88890172.5 | 01.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | AT19870001728 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: AT 172887 | [1989/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298950 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E01B7/12 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
E01B7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Herzstück | [1989/02] | English: | Railway frog | [1989/02] | French: | Coeur de voie | [1989/02] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/33] | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR670932 ; | [X]US1855969 (PARRY JONES HARRY, et al); | [X]DE2059640 (KRUPP AG HUETTENWERKE) |