EP0302852 - Process for treatment and disposal of mixtures of solids and liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOAGRAR CONSULTING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Austrasse 52 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states TECHNOAGRAR CONSULTING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Austrasse 52 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorinser, Martin Reintalweg 24 A-8042 Graz / AT | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Kurt F., et al Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Büchel, Kurt F., Dr., et al Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | ||
Former [1989/06] | Pfeifer, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner Fleischmanngasse 9 A-1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 88890205.3 | 05.08.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | AT19870001995 | 06.08.1987 Original published format: AT 199587 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302852 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302852 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
C02F3/30 (EP);
C02F1/586 (EP);
C02F3/286 (EP);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/58 (EP);
C12M45/04 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung und Entsorgung von Gemengen aus Feststoffen und Flüssigkeiten | [1989/06] | English: | Process for treatment and disposal of mixtures of solids and liquids | [1989/06] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement et l'élimination de mélanges de matières solides et liquides | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 29.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Request for further processing for: | 19.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 25.11.1992 | SE | 25.11.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1993/27] | SE | 25.11.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2240890 (ANSTETT ALFRED [FR]); | [A]DE2504412 (INDBERATUNGS AG); | [A]FR2336353 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]FR2541669 (MULTIBIO [FR]) | [ ] - A.M. BRUCE: "SEWAGE SLUDGE STABILISATION AND DISINFECTION", 1984, Seiten 330-342, Ellis Horwood Ltd., Chichester GB; Kapitel 17; D.C. BARTLET3: "Digester gas - an energy resource" |