EP0321444 - Propulsive charge for reducing the base drag of artillery projectiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORICUM MASCHINENBAU UND HANDEL GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Zollamtstrasse 1 A-4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states NORICUM MASCHINENBAU UND HANDEL GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Zollamtstrasse 1 A-4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auer, Ekkehard, Dipl. Ing. Gierkeweg 11 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
Fuchs, Wolfgang, Dipl. Ing. Raiffeisenstrasse 17 A-4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | 03 /
Lettner, Josef, Dipl. Ing. Dr. Ried 25 A-4312 Ried / AT | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M., et al Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr., et al Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 88890321.8 | 15.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | AT19870003322 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: AT 332287 | [1989/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321444 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321444 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F42B13/267, F42B5/16, F42B13/02 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
F02K9/10 (EP);
F02K9/36 (EP);
F42B10/40 (EP);
F42B5/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/25] | F42B5/16, F42B13/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Treibsatz für eine Einrichtung zur Verringerung des Bodensoges an Artilleriegeschossen | [1989/25] | English: | Propulsive charge for reducing the base drag of artillery projectiles | [1989/25] | French: | Charge propulsive pour la réduction de la traînée des projectiles d'artillerie | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/42] | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0285184 ; | [YD]DE2804270 ; | [Y]FR1547698 ; | [A]FR2038806 ; | [A]DE1160696 ; | [A]DE1479943 ; | [A]FR2183591 ; | [A]US3306204 ; | [A]US3022735 |