EP0295274 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETACHING BONDED COVERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.11.1988 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.01.1989 [1989/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIN, Josef, Theo Cheruskerstrasse 25 D-4600 Dortmund 30 / DE | 02 /
DITTMAR, Herbert Forellen-Weg 5 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | [1988/51] | Application number, filing date | 88900019.6 | 11.12.1987 | [1988/51] | WO1987EP00772 | Priority number, date | DE19863643446 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643446 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804617 | Date: | 30.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295274 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B44C7/02, B44D3/16, E04G23/00 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
B44D3/16 (EP,US);
B44C7/027 (EP,US);
E04G23/006 (EP,US);
Y10S156/929 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1184 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1972 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABLÖSEN EINES GEKLEBTEN BELAGS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN DES VERFAHRENS | [1988/51] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETACHING BONDED COVERINGS | [1988/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DECOLLAGE DE REVETEMENTS COLLES | [1988/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2018694 [ ] (EUROFLOOR SA); | DE2552611 [ ] (HUTTERER PETER); | LU76557 [ ]; | DE3333221 [ ] (HOLMSTRANDS PLAATINDUSTRI AB [SE]); | DE8617622U [ ]; | EP0200858 [ ] (RES & DEV CORP [JP]) |