EP0322423 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ABRASION-RESISTANT COATINGS, IN PARTICULAR ON SPIRAL ROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURT ZECHER GmbH Görlitzer Strasse 2 D-33098 Paderborn / DE | For all designated states Zecher, Kurt Paderstrasse 5 4790 Paderborn / DE | [1989/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAUER, Wolfgang Tannenstrasse 9 D-7507 Pfinztal-Berghausen / DE | 02 /
EISNER, Günter Elisenhof 33 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
ZECHER, Kurt Paderstrasse 5 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 88900362.0 | 16.12.1987 | [1989/27] | WO1987EP00787 | Priority number, date | DE19870009645U | 14.07.1987 Original published format: DE 8709645 U | [1989/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900507 | Date: | 26.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322423 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322423 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41N7/00, C25D15/00, C25D5/14 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B41N7/06 (EP);
B41N2207/02 (EP);
B41N2207/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ABRIEBFESTE BESCHICHTUNGEN INSBESONDERE AUF FARBÜBERTRAGUNGSWALZEN | [1989/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ABRASION-RESISTANT COATINGS, IN PARTICULAR ON SPIRAL ROLLERS | [1989/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE REVETEMENTS RESISTANTS A L'ABRASION, NOTAMMENT DE ROULEAUX CANNELES EN SPIRALES | [1989/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1585143 ; | [Y]US3449223 ; | [A]US4567827 |