EP0296195 - SYSTEM ENABLING MOBILE PERFORMERS TO INFLUENCE STAGE-EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIVE WIRE CONTRACTORS LIMITED Coombe Fishacre Newton Abbot Devon TQ12 5UQ / GB | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURNE, Nicholas, Hugh 1 Coombe House Cottages Coombe Fishacre Newton Abbot Devon TQ12 5UQ / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Alan, John 7 Francis Close Lee-on-Solent Gosport Hampshire PO13 8HB / GB | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Hoolahan, Michael John Kirklee, Church Road West Chiltington West Sussex RH20 2JW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Hoolahan, Michael John Kirklee, Church Road West Chiltington, West Sussex RH20 2JW / GB | Application number, filing date | 88900391.9 | 31.12.1987 | [1988/52] | WO1987GB00927 | Priority number, date | GB19870000043 | 03.01.1987 Original published format: GB 8700043 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804948 | Date: | 14.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296195 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63J5/00 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
A63J17/00 (EP,US);
A63J5/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG VON EFFEKTEN DURCH SICH BEWEGENDE KÜNSTLER | [1988/52] | English: | SYSTEM ENABLING MOBILE PERFORMERS TO INFLUENCE STAGE-EFFECTS | [1988/52] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT A DES ACTEURS MOBILES D'INFLUENCER LES EFFETS DE SCENE | [1988/52] | File destroyed: | 03.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1988 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/03] | 24.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2041686 [ ] (MESLIN MICHEL); | DE2152404 [ ] (BUELDT GEORG DIPL PHYS); | US3749810 [ ] (DOW A); | DE3112727 [ ] (CASPERS FRIEDHELM DIPL ING); | FR2573901 [ ] (PORTE HARRY [FR]) |