EP0442865 - A METHOD TO CONVERT TWO-DIMENSIONAL MOTION PICTURES FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GESHWIND, David 2 Lincoln Square New York, NY 10023 / US | For all designated states HANDAL, Anthony H. 80 Washington Street Norwalk, CT 06854 / US | [1991/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/28] |
Former [1991/35] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 88900534.4 | 17.12.1987 | [1991/35] | WO1987US03374 | Priority number, date | US19860227403 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: US 227403 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804804 | Date: | 30.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442865 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/72 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04N13/122 (EP,US);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N13/261 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
H04N13/15 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/289 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/334 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/339 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0092 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/35] | G06F3/14, G06F15/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMSETZUNG VON ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN FILMBILDERN FÜR DRIEDIMENSIONALE SYSTEME | [1991/35] | English: | A METHOD TO CONVERT TWO-DIMENSIONAL MOTION PICTURES FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL SYSTEMS | [1991/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONVERSION DE FILMS BIDIMENSIONNELS POUR PROJECTION PAR DES SYSTEMES TRIDIMENSIONNELS | [1991/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1989 | Search fee paid | 16.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.06.1989 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/12] | 17.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.1989 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.1989 | 10.08.1989 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.1991 | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1992 | 31.12.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1993 | 31.12.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.1994 | 31.12.1994 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4709263 (BRUMAGE JOHN [US]); | [E]US4858150 (AIZAWA TAMIO [JP], et al) | [A] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION vol. E 66, no. 10, October 1983, TOKYO JP pages 620 - 621; TAKESHI AGUI: 'A method of making pseudo-stereo pairs from a line figure' | International search | [A]US3582961 (SHINDO CHUSHIRO); | [A]US4168885 (KENT ARTHUR P, et al); | [A]US4558359 (KUPERMAN GILBERT G [US], et al); | [AP]US4641177 (GANSS ROLF [DE]); | [XP]US4704627 (YUYAMA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [XP]US4709263 (BRUMAGE JOHN [US]) |