EP0295292 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. Schmidt GmbH & Co. KG Pforzheimer Strasse 46 D-7518 Bretten / DE | [1988/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGAN DURAN, Jesus Carlos III, no 7 - 8o B E-Murcia / ES | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Lemcke, Rupert, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 88900884.3 | 19.12.1987 | [1988/51] | WO1987EP00808 | Priority number, date | ES19860003632 | 30.12.1986 Original published format: ES 8603632 | ES19860003631 | 30.12.1986 Original published format: ES 8603631 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805150 | Date: | 14.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295292 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
F28D7/103 (EP);
F28F9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHER | [1988/51] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [1988/51] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 03.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1988 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/35] | 30.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2748183 [ ]; | DE3133756 [ ]; | DE3153101 [ ]; | GB321833 [ ]; | US3889746 [ ]; | EP0013700 [ ]; | FR794469 [ ] |