EP0348401 - EPI-CARDIAL ELECTRODE WITH AN INCORPORATED CARDIAC RADIO-FREQUENCY RECEIVER (CRR) FOR TEMPORARY HEART STIMULATION FROM THE OUTSIDE, PRE-ARRANGED FOR PERMANENT STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.A. & M. S.p.A. 3, Piazza Istria 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states P.A. & M. S.p.A. 3, Piazza Istria I-00198 Rome / IT | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states S.B.M. SOCIETA BREVETTI PER LA MEDICINA Piazza Istria, 5 I-00189 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BELLIS, Ferruccio Viale Pola, 23 I-00198 Roma / IT | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 46, Via di Campo Marzio 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 23, Via Fontanella Borghese I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 88901089.8 | 21.01.1988 | [1990/01] | WO1988IT00005 | Priority number, date | IT19870047581 | 29.01.1987 Original published format: IT 4758187 | IT19870048070 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: IT 4807087 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805672 | Date: | 11.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348401 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348401 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372, A61N1/362, A61N1/05 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
A61N1/37211 (EP,US);
A61N1/0587 (EP,US);
A61N1/3625 (EP,US);
Y10S128/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/41] |
Former [1990/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | ZUR ZEITWEILIGEN HERZREIZUNG VON AUSSEN MIT EINEM RADIOFREQUENZHERZEMPFÄNGER VERSEHENE UND FÜR DAUERNDE REIZUNG VORBEREITETE EPIKARDISCHE ELEKTRODE | [1990/01] | English: | EPI-CARDIAL ELECTRODE WITH AN INCORPORATED CARDIAC RADIO-FREQUENCY RECEIVER (CRR) FOR TEMPORARY HEART STIMULATION FROM THE OUTSIDE, PRE-ARRANGED FOR PERMANENT STIMULATION | [1990/01] | French: | ELECTRODE EPICARDIQUE AVEC RECEPTEUR CARDIAQUE HF INCORPORE DESTINE A UNE STIMULATION CARDIAQUE TEMPORAIRE DEPUIS L'EXTERIEUR ET PRECON U POUR UNE STIMULATION PERMANENTE EVENTUELLE | [1990/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 13.12.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LI, LU | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.1989 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1989 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1989 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1989 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1989 | M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.1991 | 31.01.1993 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2058872 [ ] (ARION HENRI); | US4270549 [ ] (HEILMAN MARLIN S); | US4030509 [ ] (HEILMAN MARLIN S, et al); | US4640285 [ ] (DECOTE JR ROBERT [US], et al) |