EP0383753 - FUEL METERING SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 W-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLAPP, Günther Gymnasium Strasse 26 D-7024 Filderstadt 1 / DE | [1990/35] | Application number, filing date | 88901229.0 | 02.02.1988 | [1990/35] | WO1988DE00047 | Priority number, date | DE19873711398 | 04.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3711398 | [1990/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808077 | Date: | 20.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383753 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383753 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/12, F02D41/14 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
F02D41/1475 (EP,US);
F02D41/12 (KR);
F02D41/047 (EP,US);
F02D41/126 (EP,US);
F02D41/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/35] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFZUMESSSYSTEM FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [1990/35] | English: | FUEL METERING SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1990/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE DOSAGE DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1990/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 06.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4242991 [ ] (SCHERENBERG DIETER, et al); | GB2138176 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | GB2167882 [ ] (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; BAND 8; NR: 76 (M-288)(1513); 9.April 1984, & JP A 58222928 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 24.DECEMBER 1983 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; BAND 8; NR. 170 (M-315)(1607); 7. AUGUST 1984; & JP A 5965537 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 13. APRIL 1984 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; BAND8; NR. 64 (M-S85) (1501); 27.MAERZ 1984; & JP A 58214626 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 13.DECEMBER 1983 |