Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU613342B | Global Dossier | 01.08.1991 | B2 | AU1243788 | 09.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | US8703457 | 22.12.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3774440D1 | 12.12.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | US8703457 | 22.12.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR890701407 | 20.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | US8703457 | 22.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8901433 | Global Dossier | 23.02.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0371015 | Global Dossier | 06.11.1991 | B1 | EP0371015 | 06.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1303650 | 16.06.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03501001 | 07.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4778225 | 18.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US8349187 | 10.08.1987 |