EP0299050 - ISOLATION OF SINGLE CHAIN PROTEINS WITH FSH SUPPRESSING ACTIVITY FROM FOLLICULAR FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTECHNOLOGY AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 28 Barcoo Street East Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | For all designated states MONASH UNIVERSITY 1958 Wellington Road Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | For all designated states Prince Henry's Institute of Medical Research (ABN 77 601 754 678) Level 4, Block E, Monash Medical Centre 246 Clayton Road Clayton, VIC 3168 / AU | For all designated states ST. VINCENT'S INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 41 Victoria Parade Fitzroy, VIC 3065 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states BIOTECHNOLOGY AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 28 Barcoo Street East Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | ||
For all designated states MONASH UNIVERSITY 1958 Wellington Road Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
For all designated states Prince Henry's Institute of Medical Research Level 4, Block E, Monash Medical Centre 246 Clayton Road Clayton VIC 3168 / AU | |||
For all designated states ST. VINCENT'S INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 41 Victoria Parade Fitzroy, VIC 3065 / AU | |||
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states BIOTECHNOLOGY AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 28 Barcoo Street East Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | ||
For all designated states MONASH UNIVERSITY 1958 Wellington Road Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
For all designated states MONASH MEDICAL CENTRE St. Kilda Road Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | |||
For all designated states ST. VINCENT'S INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 41 Victoria Parade Fitzroy, VIC 3065 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE KRETSER, David, Morritz 1 Leura Street Surrey Hills, VIC 3127 / AU | 02 /
BURGER, Henry, George 36 Berry Street East Melbourne, VIC 3002 / AU | 03 /
HEARN, Milton, Thomas, William 263 Union Road Balwyn, VIC 3103 / AU | 04 /
MILNE-ROBERTSON, David, Mark 6 Floreat Court Glen Waverley, Vic 3150 / AU | 05 /
WETTENHALL, Richard, Edward, Hugh 23 Royal Crescent Camberwell, VIC 3124 / AU | 06 /
MCLACHLAN, Robert, Ian 3814 North East 87th Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 07 /
DE VOS, Fiona 39 Kirstina Road Glen Waverley, VIC 3150 / AU | [1995/02] |
Former [1991/49] | 01 /
DE KRETSER, David, Morritz 1 Leura Street Surrey Hills, VIC 3127 / AU | ||
02 /
BURGER, Henry, George 36 Berry Street East Melbourne, VIC 3002 / AU | |||
03 /
HEARN, Milton, Thomas, William 263 Union Road Balwyn, VIC 3103 / AU | |||
04 /
MILNE-ROBERTSON, David, Mark David Mark 6 Floreat Court / AU | |||
05 /
WETTENHALL, Richard, Edward, Hugh 23 Royal Crescent Camberwell, VIC 3124 / AU | |||
06 /
MCLACHLAN, Robert, Ian 3814 North East 87th Seattle, WA 98115 / US | |||
07 /
DE VOS, Fiona 39 Kirstina Road Glen Wawerley, VIC 3150 / AU | |||
Former [1989/03] | 01 /
DE KRETSER, David, Morritz 1 Leura Street Surrey Hills, VIC 3127 / AU | ||
02 /
BURGER, Henry, George 36 Berry Street East Melbourne, VIC 3002 / AU | |||
03 /
HEARN, Milton, Thomas, William 263 Union Road Balwyn, VIC 3103 / AU | |||
04 /
ROBERTSON, David, Mark 6 Floreat Court Glen Waverley, VIC 3150 / AU | |||
05 /
WETTENHALL, Richard, Edward, Hugh 23 Royal Crescent Camberwell, VIC 3124 / AU | |||
06 /
MCLACHLAN, Robert, Ian 3814 North East 87th Seattle, WA 98115 / US | |||
07 /
DE VOS, Fiona 39 Kirstina Road Glen Wawerley, VIC 3150 / AU | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88901526.9 | 29.01.1988 | [1989/03] | WO1988AU00024 | Priority number, date | AU19870000081 | 29.01.1987 Original published format: AU 8187 | AU19870002525 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: AU 252587 | AU19870005765 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: AU 576587 | AU19870005766 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: AU 576687 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805789 | Date: | 11.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299050 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299050 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.08.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/575, A61K38/04, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, C12P21/00 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07K14/575 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/03] | C07K15/12, C07K15/14, C07K3/02, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, C12P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNG VON EINKETTIGEN PROTEINEN MIT FSH UNTER- DRÜCKENDER AKTIVITÄT AUS FOLLIKULARFLÜSSIGKEIT | [1995/12] | English: | ISOLATION OF SINGLE CHAIN PROTEINS WITH FSH SUPPRESSING ACTIVITY FROM FOLLICULAR FLUID | [1989/03] | French: | ISOLEMENT A PARTIR DE FLUIDE FOLLICULAIRE DE PROTEINES A CHAINE UNIQUE AVEC ACTIVITE DE SUPPRESSION DE LA FSH | [1989/03] |
Former [1989/03] | ISOLIERUNG VON EINZELSTRÄNGIGEN PROTEINEN MIT FSH UNTERDRÜCKENDER AKTIVITÄT AUS FOLLIKULARFLÜSSIGKEIT | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1988 | Search fee paid | 13.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.1995 | [1996/02] | Cited in | International search | [XP] - Proceedings of National Academy of Sciences, USA, Volume 84, No. 23, issued December 1987, N. UENO et al., "Isolation and Partial Characterization of Follistatin: A Single-Chain Mr 35,000 Monomeric Protein that Inhibits the Release of Follicle-Stimulating Hormone", pages 8282-8286. | [XP] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Volume 149, No. 1, 1987, 30 November 1987 (30.11.87), (Academic Press, Inc.), S. YING et al., "Follistatin Specifically Inhibits Pituitary Follicle Stimulating Hormone Release IN VITRO", pages 133-139. | [XP] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Volume 149, No. 2, 1987, 16 December 1987 (16.12.87), (Academic Press, Inc.), D.M. ROBERTSON et al., "The Isolation of Polypeptides with FSH Suppressing Activity from Bovine Follicular Fluid which are Structurally Different to Inhibin", pages 744-749. | [A] - Journal of Endocrinology Ltd, (1987), Volume 113, L.J. LEVERSHA et al., "Isolation of Inhibin from Ovine Follicular Fluid", pages 213-221. | Examination | - Proceedings of National Academy of Sciences, USA, vol. 84, no. 23, issued December 1987, N. Ueno et al., pp. 8282-8286 | - Biochemical and Biophyscal Research Communications, vol. 149, no. 1, 1987, 30 November 1987, (Academic Press, Inc.), S. Ying et al., pp. 133-139 | - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, vol. 149, no. 2, 1987, 16 December 1987, (Academic Press, Inc.), D.M. Robertson et al., pp. 744-749 |