EP0334900 - UNDERCUTTING DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Upat GmbH & Co. Postfach 13 20 D-79303 Emmendingen / DE | [1989/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINKLAKE, Manfred Studentenweg 23 D-6382 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 02 /
STEURER, Paul Belchenstrasse 9 D-7830 Teningen / DE | 03 /
FRISCHMANN, Albert Hürnheimweg 3 D-7832 Kenzingen / DE | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Rackette, Karl Postfach 1310 79013 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Rackette, Karl, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.-Ing Postfach 1310 D-79013 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88901542.6 | 06.02.1988 | [1989/40] | WO1988DE00058 | Priority number, date | DE19873704491 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704491 | [1989/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806070 | Date: | 25.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0334900 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334900 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00, B23B31/08 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
B60T8/3675 (EP,US);
B23B31/08 (EP,US);
B23B51/0045 (EP,US);
B60T15/028 (EP,US);
H05K7/14 (EP,US);
H01R13/447 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R4/02 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17017 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | HINTERSCHNITTBOHRER | [1989/40] | English: | UNDERCUTTING DRILL | [1989/40] | French: | FORET POUR REALISER DES PERCAGES A DEPOUILLE | [1991/39] |
Former [1989/40] | FORET POUR REALISER DES PER AGES A DEPOUILLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.1992
22.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE KEIL Werkzeugfabrik Karl Eischeid GmbH Postfach 11 58 D-51751 Engelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Sturies, Herbert, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Herbert Sturies Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | [1992/31] | 31.07.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.02.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.04.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.09.1991 | GB | 25.09.1991 | IT | 25.09.1991 | NL | 25.09.1991 | AT | 06.02.1992 | SE | 07.02.1992 | FR | 14.02.1992 | CH | 29.02.1992 | LI | 29.02.1992 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/16] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
CH | 25.09.1991 | ||
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
IT | 25.09.1991 | ||
LI | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
AT | 06.02.1992 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
LU | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
IT | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
AT | 06.02.1992 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
LU | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
IT | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
AT | 06.02.1992 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
AT | 06.02.1992 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
SE | 07.02.1992 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/36] | BE | 25.09.1991 | |
GB | 25.09.1991 | ||
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | GB | 25.09.1991 | |
NL | 25.09.1991 | ||
FR | 14.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 25.09.1991 | Cited in | International search | US2392039 [ ] (GIDEON VICTOR W); | GB579528 [ ] (FAIREY AVIAT CO LTD, et al); | DE3022464 [ ] (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG [DE]); | DE3143462 [ ] (HAWERA PROBST KG HARTMETALL [DE]) |