EP0346383 - HYDROLYSIS OF ACTIVATED OLEFINIC ALDEHYDES AND KETONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/51] | HYDROLYSIS OF ACTIVATED OLEFINIC KETONES AND ALDEHYDES | ||
[1994/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRIES & FRIES, INC. 1199 Edison Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45216 / US | [1992/26] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard St. Louis MO 63114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLFINI, Joseph, E. 21 Carpenters Ridge Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 02 /
GLINKA, Jerome 5673 Meryton Place Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88902311.5 | 01.02.1988 | [1989/51] | WO1988US00420 | Priority number, date | US19870010902 | 04.02.1987 Original published format: US 10902 | US19870123137 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: US 123137 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805771 | Date: | 11.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346383 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346383 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/54, C07C45/67, C07C45/78, C07C45/28, C07C47/54, C07C49/78, C07C47/02, C07C49/203, C07C47/58 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
C07C45/54 (EP,US);
C07C45/42 (KR);
C07B41/06 (KR);
C07C27/00 (KR);
C07C45/28 (EP,US);
C07C45/673 (EP,US);
C07C45/78 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | HYDROLYSE VON AKTIVIERTEN OLEFINISCHEN ALDEHYDEN UND KETONEN | [1994/37] | English: | HYDROLYSIS OF ACTIVATED OLEFINIC ALDEHYDES AND KETONES | [1994/37] | French: | HYDROLYSE D'ALDEHYDES ET DE CETONES OLEFINIQUES ACTIVES | [1994/37] |
Former [1989/51] | HYDROLYSE VON AKTIVIERTEN OLEFINISCHEN KETONEN UND ALDEHYDEN | ||
Former [1989/51] | HYDROLYSIS OF ACTIVATED OLEFINIC KETONES AND ALDEHYDES | ||
Former [1989/51] | HYDROLYSE DE CETONES OU D'ALDEHYDES OLEFINIQUES ACTIVES | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 05.09.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94200013.4 / EP0606934 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Request for further processing for: | 10.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE875512 [ ] (BAYER AG); | GB1519093 [ ] (RHONE POULENC IND); | US4617419 [ ] (WIENER CHARLES [US], et al) |