EP0359740 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CRACKERS OF GRANULAR MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1994 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN DEN BERGHE, René Baneike 24 B-9660 Brakel / BE | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/13] | Application number, filing date | 88902375.0 | 22.02.1988 | [1990/13] | WO1988BE00005 | Priority number, date | BE19870000173 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: BE 8700173 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806425 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359740 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359740 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
A21B5/02 (EP,US);
D01F11/00 (KR);
A23G3/02 (KR);
A23L7/178 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KEKS AUS GRANULIERTEM STOFF | [1990/13] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CRACKERS OF GRANULAR MATERIAL | [1990/13] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BISCUITS EN MATERIAU GRANULAIRE | [1990/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 29.06.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.1989 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | 20.11.1989 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1989 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.01.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   25.01.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1991 | CH | 21.08.1991 | LI | 21.08.1991 | [1994/45] |
Former [1992/34] | AT | 21.08.1991 | |
CH | 21.08.1991 | ||
LI | 21.08.1991 | ||
FR | 10.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 21.08.1991 | |
CH | 21.08.1991 | ||
LI | 21.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | CH | 21.08.1991 | |
LI | 21.08.1991 | Cited in | International search | FR2201406 [ ] (KAISA KOMATSU SEISAKUSKO KK [JP]); | US3949660 [ ] (KUHLMAN HARVEY G); | EP0006575 [ ] (GEVAERT OMER [BE]); | DE3019798 [ ] (AIRIN OKAZAKI KK); | BE904631 [ ] (GEVAERT OMER); | FR2577760 [ ] (LB SA [FR]) |