EP0418221 - COMBINED SECONDARY CIRCUIT REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERGFELL, Rainer Langbehnstrasse 11a D-8000 München 21 / DE | 02 /
PANSE, Hubert Kleinstrasse 52 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 03 /
SCHLEGEL, Wolfgang Mathunistrasse 9 a D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1991/13] | Application number, filing date | 88902394.1 | 15.03.1988 | [1991/13] | WO1988DE00154 | Priority number, date | DE19873713541 | 22.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3713541 | [1991/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808637 | Date: | 03.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418221 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
H02M3/1582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTER SEKUNDÄRSCHALTREGLER | [1991/13] | English: | COMBINED SECONDARY CIRCUIT REGULATOR | [1991/13] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REGULATION SECONDAIRE COMBINE | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.07.1989 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 22.03.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3427520 [ ]; | US4618812 [ ]; | DE1905369 [ ] |