EP0308457 - OCULAR OBSERVATION DEVICE, UTILIZING THE REFLECTION OF AN INFRARED BEAM FROM THE EYEBALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For all designated states DE SCAN 10 Rue de Presles F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | ||
For all designated states DE SCAN 10 Rue de Presles F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBERT, Jean-Claude 34, chaussée de l'Etang F-94160 Saint-Mandé / FR | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88902871.8 | 21.03.1988 | [1989/13] | WO1988FR00150 | Priority number, date | FR19870003906 | 20.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8703906 | [1989/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806859 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308457 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
A61B3/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUGENBEOBACHTUNG MITTELS VOM AUGAPFEL REFLEKTIERTER INFRAROT-STRAHLUNG | [1989/13] | English: | OCULAR OBSERVATION DEVICE, UTILIZING THE REFLECTION OF AN INFRARED BEAM FROM THE EYEBALL | [1989/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBSERVATION DE L' IL UTILISANT LA REFLEXION D'UN RAYONNEMENT INFRAROUGE PAR LE GLOBE OCULAIRE | [1989/13] | File destroyed: | 16.05.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/51] | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2587191 [ ]; | WO8603113 [ ]; | WO8604799 [ ]; | DE3124192 [ ]; | GB1578136 [ ]; | FR2382056 [ ] |