EP0305497 - FERTILITY PREDICTION BY USE OF CLOMIPHENE CHALLENGE TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAVOT, Daniel 30 Creston Avenue Tenafly, NJ 07670 / US | [1989/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1989/10] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88903100.1 | 15.03.1988 | [1989/10] | WO1988US00813 | Priority number, date | US19870026879 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: US 26879 | [1989/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806863 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305497 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305497 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, G01N33/53 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
A61B10/0012 (EP);
G01N33/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | FRUCHTBARKEITSVORHERSAGE DURCH VERWENDUNG EINES CLOMIPHEN-KONTROLLSATZES | [1989/10] | English: | FERTILITY PREDICTION BY USE OF CLOMIPHENE CHALLENGE TEST | [1989/10] | French: | PREVISION DE LA FERTILITE PAR UTILISATION D'UN TEST DE CONFRONTATION AU CLOMIFENE | [1989/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1988 | Search fee paid | 13.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2146865 [ ] | [ ] - "OVUKIT self test for ovulation prediction", 1988, Monoclonal Antibodies, Inc., Sunnyvale, CA, US; page 1. | International search | [Y]US4514505 ; | [A]US4339434 ; | [A]US4278668 | [Y] - Endocrinology, Vol. 84, No. 4, issued April 1969 (William and Wilkins, Baltimore, MD 21202), H. BAIER et al, "Effect of Clomiphene Upon Plasma FSH Activity...", pages 946-949, see Abstract. | [Y] - American Journal of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Vol. 107, No. 8, issued 15 August 1970 (C.V. Mosby Co., St. Louis, MO 63146), A.V. SCHALLY et al, "Alteration of LH and FSH Release in Rats Treated with Clomiphene or its Isomers", pages 1156-1167, see Abstract. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 76, No. 23, issued 5 June 1972 (CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Service, Columbus OH 43210) page 60, Abstract No. 135965h, G. GIUSTINA et al, "Clomiphene Induced Modifications of Plasma LH Measured by Radioimmunoassay" see whole Abstract. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, No. 15, issued 13 October 1986 (CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Service, Columbus OH 43210), page 98, Abstract No. 127655j, N. TERAKAWA et al, "A Possible Role of Clomiphene Citrate in the Control of Preovulatory LH Surge..", see whole Abstract. |