EP0346395 - Process for filling and closing receptacles containing a pharmaceutically pure substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/51] | ELASTOMERIC CLOSURE PIECE | ||
[1992/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharma-Gummi Wimmer West GmbH Stolberger Strasse 21-41 52249 Eschweiler / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states Pharma-Gummi Wimmer West GmbH Stolberger Strasse 21-41 D-52249 Eschweiler / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMBERG, Val, G. 7930 Beverly Boulevard Upper Darby, PA 19082 / US | 02 /
KIANG, Patty, H. 3563 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
CURRY, Wayne, T. 1035 Belleview Avenue Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903172.0 | 11.04.1988 | [1989/51] | WO1988DE00224 | Priority number, date | US19870037959 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: US 37959 | [1989/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808012 | Date: | 20.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346395 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346395 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08L65/04, B65D39/18, C09D165/00 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B65D39/0011 (EP,US);
B67B7/92 (KR);
B65D39/0058 (EP,US);
B65D39/007 (EP,US);
B65D39/0076 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C09D165/04 (EP,US);
B65D2539/003 (EP,US);
B65D2539/008 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2465/00 (EP,US);
Y10S220/19 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31833 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/51] | C08J7/04, C09D3/49, C08L65/04, B65D39/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abfüllen und Verschliessen von Behältern mit pharmazeutisch reinem Inhalt | [1992/29] | English: | Process for filling and closing receptacles containing a pharmaceutically pure substance | [1992/29] | French: | Procédé pour remplir et fermer des récipients contenant une substance pharmaceutiquement pure | [1992/29] |
Former [1989/51] | ELASTOMERES VERSCHLUSSTEIL | ||
Former [1989/51] | ELASTOMERIC CLOSURE PIECE | ||
Former [1989/51] | PIECE ELASTOMERE DE FERMETURE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3288728 [ ] (GORHAM WILLIAM F); | US3379803 [ ] (TITTMANN FREDERICK R, et al); | US4225647 [ ] (PARENT RICHARD A); | EP0205312 [ ] (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP], et al) | [A] - Journal of Polymer Science: Polymer Chemistry Edition, Band 22, 1984, John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (New York, US), P. Kramer et al.: "Polymerization of para-xylyene derivatives (parylene polymerization). I. Deposition kinetics for parylene N and parylene C", Seiten 475-491 |