EP0318528 - PROCESS FOR TREATING FRESHLY CUT TIMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOP-COOP IDEGENFORGALMI ES VENDEGLATOIPARI KISSZÖVETKEZET Vitkovics M. u. 3 H-1052 Budapest / HU | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERDÖSI, György Ipolyság u. 14/b H-1183 Budapest / HU | 02 /
BALINT, László Lo "csei u. 25 H-1212 Budapest / HU | 03 /
OSVATH, Péter Kelen J. u. 2 H-1142 Budapest / HU | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/23] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903339.5 | 20.04.1988 | [1989/23] | WO1988HU00023 | Priority number, date | HU19870001983 | 04.05.1987 Original published format: HU 198387 | [1989/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808780 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318528 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318528 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 17.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B27K5/04, F26B3/00 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B27K3/18 (EP,US);
B27K3/32 (EP,US);
B27K5/001 (EP,US);
B27K5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FRISCHHOLZ | [1989/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING FRESHLY CUT TIMBER | [1989/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE BOIS VERT | [1989/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3321321 (HANS ABRECHT, et al); | [A]DE2460392 (WILKE KLAUS DIETHER); | [A]DE1796149 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Sektion C, Band 1, Nr. 29, 28. Marz 1977 (28.03.77), The Patent Office Japanese Government, siehe Seite 1563 C 76, Kokai-Nr. 51-148 692 (SHUMUZU KENSETSU K.K.): "Method for Treating the Active Carbon without Reducing the Nitrogen Dioxide." |