EP0312603 - ROTARY INJECTION BLOW MOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aoki, Shigeto 6037 Ohazaminamijo Sakakimachi Hanishina-gun Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Aoki, Shigeto 6037 Ohazaminamijo Sakakimachi Hanishina-gun Nagano-ken / JP | ||
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states AOKI, Katashi (deceased) Legally represented by SATORU KIMURA 3-5-6, Saido Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Katashi deceased / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Bauer Hubbuch, Twelmeier Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Rudolf Bauer Dipl.-Ing.Helmut Hubbuch, Dipl.Phys. Ulrich Twelmeier Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903386.6 | 20.04.1988 | [1989/17] | WO1988JP00387 | Priority number, date | JP19860000966 | 20.04.1987 Original published format: JP 96686 | [1989/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808366 | Date: | 03.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312603 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312603 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/36, B29C49/06, B29C49/08, B29C49/48, B29L22/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
B29C49/062 (EP,US);
B29C49/36 (KR);
B29C45/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/08 (KR);
B29C49/48 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/17] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE EINSPRITZBLASGIESSVORRICHTUNG | [1989/17] | English: | ROTARY INJECTION BLOW MOLDING MACHINE | [1989/17] | French: | MACHINE ROTATIVE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION-SOUFFLAGE | [1989/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1988 | Translation filed | 16.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1988 | Search fee paid | 16.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.06.1992 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1992/39] | 21.08.1997 | Resumption of proceedings | [1997/35] | 17.06.1992 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1997/35] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3990826 (MARCUS PAUL); | [A]JPS5770620 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPS57159624 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]JPS60244518 (KATASHI AOKI) |