EP0303694 - IMPROVED ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT ANALYTICAL INC. 600 South Harbor Boulevard La Habra, California 90631 / US | [1994/24] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states BECKMAN INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION 600 South Harbor Boulevard La Habra, CA 90631 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETI, Radhakrishna, Murty 945 E. Redbud Street Brea, CA 92621 / US | 02 /
FREUND, David, Howard 2548 Deodar Pomona, CA 91767 / US | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1989/08] | Arthur, John William FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 88903508.5 | 24.02.1988 | [1989/08] | WO1988US00667 | Priority number, date | US19870017719 | 24.02.1987 Original published format: US 17719 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806729 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303694 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303694 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.09.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N27/416 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
G01N27/404 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/08] | G01N27/30, G01N27/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHER SENSOR | [1989/08] | English: | IMPROVED ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR | [1989/08] | French: | DECTECTEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE AMELIORE | [1989/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1988 | Search fee paid | 16.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Request for further processing for: | 28.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.1991 | 02.03.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.1994 | BE | 10.08.1994 | CH | 10.08.1994 | LI | 10.08.1994 | NL | 10.08.1994 | SE | 10.11.1994 | LU | 28.02.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/29] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 10.08.1994 | |
LI | 10.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3429796 (LAUER JAY M); | [A]FR2010648 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]EP0027005 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) | International search | [A]US3574078 (HYNES JOHN P, et al); | [A]DE3029153 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |