EP0308491 - DYNAMIC PROCESS CONTROL FOR ELECTROSTATOGRAPHIC MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSHING, Allen, J. 429 Tara Lane Webster, NY 14650 / US | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903626.5 | 28.03.1988 | [1989/13] | WO1988US00953 | Priority number, date | US19870034363 | 06.04.1987 Original published format: US 34363 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808156 | Date: | 20.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308491 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308491 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G15/06 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
G03G15/5041 (EP,US);
G03G15/065 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/13] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE STEUERUNGSKONTROLLE FÜR ELEKTROSTATOGRAPHISCHE MASCHINEN | [1989/13] | English: | DYNAMIC PROCESS CONTROL FOR ELECTROSTATOGRAPHIC MACHINES | [1989/13] | French: | COMMANDE DE TRAITEMENT DYNAMIQUE POUR MACHINES ELECTROSTATOGRAPHIQUES | [1989/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 04.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP6117159 ; | [A]JP6148876 ; | US3788739 [ ] (CORIALE S); | US3918395 [ ] (FEARNSIDE WILLIAM T); | EP0037711 [ ] (XEROX CORP [US]); | US4319544 [ ] (WEBER HAROLD J) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 10, no. 165 (P-467)(2221), 12 June 1986; & JP-A-6117159 (CANON K.K.)25 January 1986, & JP6117159 A 19860125 | [A] - IEEE Transactions on Industry Applications, vol. IA-20, no. 3, part 1, May-June 1984, IEEE (New York, US), W.D. Greason et al.: "Corona charging method for controlled production of film electrets", pages 687 ́693 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 10, no. 210 (P-479)(2266), 23 July 1986; & JP-A-6148876 (CANON INC.) 10 March 1986, & JP6148876 A 19860310 | Examination | JP6148876 | - Patent Abstacts of Japan, vol. 10, no. 210 (P-479)(2266), 23 July 1986, & JP, A, 6148876, & JP6148876 A 19860723 |