EP0308492 - PRINTER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAM, Hieu, T. 610 Plank Road Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
ZEISE, Eric, K. 7 Creekwood Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 03 /
NG, Yee, S. 15 Great Garland Rise Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 04 /
TSCHANG, Pin, S. 883 Winona Boulevard Rochester, NY 14617 / US | 05 /
KIEFFER, Kenneth, D. 8 Pineridge Drive Rochester, NY 14624 / US | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Peter, et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903629.9 | 29.03.1988 | [1989/13] | WO1988US00958 | Priority number, date | US19870033550 | 01.04.1987 Original published format: US 33550 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807729 | Date: | 06.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308492 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308492 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/12 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
G06K15/1247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/13] | Title | German: | DRUCKGERÄT | [1989/13] | English: | PRINTER APPARATUS | [1989/13] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION | [1989/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.09.1993 | [1994/25] | Cited in | International search | DE3422907 [ ]; | GB2104266 [ ]; | US4571602 [ ]; | WO8702162 [ ] | Examination | - IEEE Transactions on Consumer Electronics, vol. CE-32, no. 1, February 1986, IEEE, (New York, US), J. Burkhart et al.: "A monolithically integrated 128 LED-driver and its application", pages 26-31, see figures 3,4; page 28, left-hand column, line 6 - page 29, left-hand column, line 19 |