EP0360813 - FURNITURE ADJUSTMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOBBINS, John Clifford Whistlers Farm House TANGLEY, Nr. Andover, Hampshire SP11 OSB / GB | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88903905.3 | 06.05.1988 | [1990/14] | WO1988GB00359 | Priority number, date | GB19870010988 | 08.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8710988 | GB19870020580 | 02.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8720580 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808682 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360813 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/38, A47B91/02 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
A47B91/02 (EP,US);
A47C3/38 (EP,US);
A47C7/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HÖHENVERSTELLUNG VON MÖBELN | [1990/14] | English: | FURNITURE ADJUSTMENT DEVICE | [1990/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE D'UN MEUBLE | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 04.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2107629 [ ] (HOPKINS DALLAS CONSTANCE); | US1549144 [ ] (MESSEGEE HERNDON L) |