EP0359763 - MODULAR EXPANDABLE HOUSING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RACAL DATA COMMUNICATIONS INC. 1601 North Harrison Parkway Sunrise Florida 33323 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states RACAL DATA COMMUNICATIONS INC. 1601 North Harrison Parkway Sunrise Florida 33323 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURON, Douglas, J. 9838 N.W. 3rd Street Plantation, FL 33324 / US | 02 /
STEINMAN, Sheldon 3842 S.W. 67th Terrace Miramar, FL 33023 / US | 03 /
WRAY, Donald, L. 8711 N.W. 48th Court Lauderdale, FL 33321 / US | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Obee, Robert William Racal Group Services Ltd. Group Legal Department Richmond Court 309 Fleet Road Fleet, Hampshire GU13 8BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Obee, Robert William Racal Group Services Ltd. Group Legal Department Richmond Court 309 Fleet Road Fleet, Hampshire GU13 8BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904033.3 | 04.04.1988 | [1990/13] | WO1988US01013 | Priority number, date | US19870042186 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: US 42186 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808662 | Date: | 03.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359763 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K5/02, H01R23/68, H01R13/658 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
B22C1/2253 (EP,US);
H05K7/1435 (EP,US);
H05K7/1461 (EP,US);
Y10S439/928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1990/13] | Title | German: | MODULARES AUSDEHNBARES GEHÄUSE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [1990/13] | English: | MODULAR EXPANDABLE HOUSING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [1990/13] | French: | BOITIER MODULAIRE EXTENSIBLE POUR APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1989 | Search fee paid | 29.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 04.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/21] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further document | International search | [A]US4226491 (KAZAMA KAZUO, et al); | [A]US4401351 (RECORD GRANT C [US]); | [A]US4466049 (CHANEY JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US4501460 (SISLER JOHN R [US]); | [A]US4558914 (PRAGER JAY M [US], et al) |