EP0349595 - EDGE CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLASSON, Edwin, O. 20 Lancaster Road Berlin, MA 01503 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Colin, C. 765-23 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
GREGORY, Frank, S. 486 Bedford Road New Boston, NH 03070 / US | 04 /
KITZMAN, George, R. 20 Warton Road Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 05 /
LUPIEN, R., Clifford 360 Front Street Winchendon, MA 01475 / US | 06 /
MOONEY, William, C. P.O. Box 14 RR 3 Kinburn, Ontario K0A 2H0 / CA | 07 /
SINGER, Michael, T. 10 Sewell Way Kanata, Ontario K2L 2W5 / CA | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904298.2 | 15.03.1988 | [1990/02] | WO1988US00811 | Priority number, date | US19870026735 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: US 26735 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807271 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349595 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349595 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/70 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
H01R12/725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTEN-STECKVERBINDER | [1990/02] | English: | EDGE CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARDS | [1990/02] | French: | CONNECTEUR PLAT POUR CARTES DE CIRCUITS | [1990/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 18.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 21.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.1990 | 02.04.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1991 | 31.03.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.1994 | BE | 02.11.1994 | CH | 02.11.1994 | FR | 02.11.1994 | IT | 02.11.1994 | LI | 02.11.1994 | NL | 02.11.1994 | SE | 02.02.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
BE | 02.11.1994 | ||
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
IT | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
FR | 31.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
BE | 02.11.1994 | ||
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
FR | 31.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
BE | 02.11.1994 | ||
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
FR | 31.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
FR | 31.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
CH | 02.11.1994 | ||
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 02.11.1994 | Cited in | International search | US3475657 [ ] (KNOWLES ROBERT G); | WO8502499 [ ] (NOSCHESE ROCCO); | FR2566590 [ ] (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |