EP0358698 - A METHOD FOR PREPARING PREPRESSED CHEESE CURD BLOCKS AND AN ASSEMBLY FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APV PASILAC A/S Ostmarken 7 2860 Soborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states APV PASILAC A/S Ostmarken 7 DK-2860 Soborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOVHAUGE, Erik Lervangen 12 Dk-7120 Vejle / DK | 02 /
JORGENSEN, Eskil, Bone Brorsonsvej 7 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | 03 /
NIELSEN, Per, Grostol Sensommervej 125 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | 04 /
SORENSEN, Christian, Brusgaard Grönnemose Allé 134 DK-2860 Söborg / DK | [1991/44] |
Former [1990/12] | 01 /
SKOVHAUGE, Erik Lervangen 12 Dk-7120 Vejle / DK | ||
02 /
J RGENSEN, Eskil, Bone Brorsonsvej 7 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | |||
03 /
NIELSEN, Per, Grost l Sensommervej 125 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | |||
04 /
S RENSEN, Christian, Brusgaard Gr nnegade 23 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88904503.5 | 13.05.1988 | [1990/12] | WO1988DK00078 | Priority number, date | DK19870002508 | 18.05.1987 Original published format: DK 250887 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809118 | Date: | 01.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358698 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358698 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/11 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
A01J25/114 (EP,US);
A01J25/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON VORGEPRESSTEN KÄSEBLÖCKEN SOWIE EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1990/12] | English: | A METHOD FOR PREPARING PREPRESSED CHEESE CURD BLOCKS AND AN ASSEMBLY FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [1990/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE BLOCS DE FROMAGE PRECOMPRIMES A BASE DE CAILLE ET UNITE DE REALISATION DUDIT PROCEDE | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 14.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.10.1991 | BE | 30.10.1991 | CH | 30.10.1991 | FR | 30.10.1991 | IT | 30.10.1991 | LI | 30.10.1991 | LU | 31.05.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
BE | 30.10.1991 | ||
CH | 30.10.1991 | ||
IT | 30.10.1991 | ||
LI | 30.10.1991 | ||
FR | 20.03.1992 | ||
LU | 31.05.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
BE | 30.10.1991 | ||
CH | 30.10.1991 | ||
IT | 30.10.1991 | ||
LI | 30.10.1991 | ||
FR | 20.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
BE | 30.10.1991 | ||
CH | 30.10.1991 | ||
LI | 30.10.1991 | ||
FR | 20.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
CH | 30.10.1991 | ||
LI | 30.10.1991 | ||
FR | 20.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
CH | 30.10.1991 | ||
LI | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | CH | 30.10.1991 | |
LI | 30.10.1991 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3559287 (BRONKHORST ARMAND FRANCOIS); | [A]US3695893 (CZULAK JOSEPH, et al); | [X]US4217818 (HAZEN GRETZ L [US]); | [A]GB2064292 (ALFA LAVAL AB); | [A]US4300445 (HAZEN GRETZ L); | [X]DE2827257 | [X] - DERWENT' ABSTRACT No. 83-831312/48, SU 982 629 |