EP0317596 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR GRIPPING PLIERS OF A TELEMANIPULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | Correction of patent specification | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE D'EXPLOITATION DE LA CALHENE 1 rue du Petit Clamart F-78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [1989/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEILLAUCHET, Eric 36, rue de la Vallée-du-Loir Areines F-41100 Vendôme / FR | 02 /
BANDIERA, Angelo 1, rue des Etats-Unis F-41100 Vendôme / FR | 03 /
GIRAULT, Laurent 21, rue Denis-Papin F-41000 Blois / FR | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/22] | Application number, filing date | 88904563.9 | 19.05.1988 | [1989/22] | WO1988FR00253 | Priority number, date | FR19870007067 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8707067 | [1989/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809247 | Date: | 01.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317596 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317596 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0317596 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/04, B25J3/00 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
B25J15/04 (EP,US);
B25J3/00 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1989/22] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR GREIFER EINES TELEMANIPULATORS | [1989/22] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR GRIPPING PLIERS OF A TELEMANIPULATOR | [1989/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR PINCE DE PREHENSION D'UN TELEMANIPULATEUR | [1989/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0104118 [ ] (CALHENE [FR], et al) |