EP0382725 - METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR NEUTRALIZATION/IMMUNOINHIBITION ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COULTER ELECTRONICS INC. 590 W. 20th Street Hialeah Florida 33010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states COULTER ELECTRONICS INC. 590 W. 20th Street Hialeah Florida 33010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Frank, J. 2143 Bethel Boulevard Boca Raton, FL 33432 / US | 02 /
HO, Show-jiuan 15735 S.W. 87th Avenue Miami, FL 33157 / US | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904874.0 | 11.05.1988 | [1990/34] | WO1988US01553 | Priority number, date | US19870048712 | 12.05.1987 Original published format: US 48712 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808984 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382725 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/573 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP);
G01N33/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TESTVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER NEUTRALISATIONS-/IMMUNOINHIBITIONSANALYSE | [1990/34] | English: | METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR NEUTRALIZATION/IMMUNOINHIBITION ASSAY | [1990/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET KIT PERMETTANT L'ANALYSE DE NEUTRALISATION/IMMUNOINHIBITION | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.1989 | Search fee paid | 16.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/42] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 32, no. 6, 1988, page 1137, abstract no. 432, Winston-Salem, N.C., US; C.E. SEWELL et al.: "Automated determination of CK-MB isoenzyme" | International search | [X]US4067775 | [X] - Clinical Chemistry, Volume 33, No. 2, issued February 1987 (Easton, Pennsylvania, USA), W.E. WEISER, "Kinetic Immunochemical Method for the Simultaneous Quantification of Creatine Kinase Isoenzymes" see page 237, column 1 and Table 3. | [X] - W. GERHARDT, "Methods of Enzymatic Analysis", Volume III, published 1983, by Verlag Chemie (Deerfield Beach, Florida, USA), see page 535, lines 8-15, page 536, lines 12-25 and page 538, lines 1-9. |