EP0324808 - ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE FOR FASTENING TO A PROFILE RAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber AG Sedelstrasse 2 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [1992/41] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states Weber AG Fabrik elektrotechnischer Artikel und Apparate Sedelstrasse 2 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCH, Arthur Ahornweg 5 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | 02 /
MISCHON, Daniel Sonhalde 9 CH-6206 Neuenkirch / CH | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Lauer, Joachim, Dr. Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 88905647.9 | 07.07.1988 | [1989/30] | WO1988CH00120 | Priority number, date | CH19870002724 | 17.07.1987 Original published format: CH 272487 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900781 | Date: | 26.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324808 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324808 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/04 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
H02B1/052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES SCHALTGERÄT ZUR BEFESTIGUNG AUF EINE PROFILSCHIENE | [1989/30] | English: | ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE FOR FASTENING TO A PROFILE RAIL | [1989/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIGUILLAGE ELECTRIQUE DESTINE A ETRE FIXE A UN RAIL PROFILE | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.03.1993 | IT | 17.03.1993 | NL | 17.03.1993 | SE | 17.03.1993 | AT | 07.07.1993 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
IT | 17.03.1993 | ||
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
AT | 07.07.1993 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
AT | 07.07.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | NL | 17.03.1993 | |
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/45] | NL | 17.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | FR1524627 [ ] (SCHRACK ELEK ZITATS A G E); | EP0061664 [ ] (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]); | DE8712955U [ ] |