EP0401216 - ARRANGEMENT FOR WARMING UP THE INK IN THE WRITE HEAD OF AN INK PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEPEL, Ernst Luitpoldstr. 9 D-8034 Germering / DE | 02 /
SCHIERJOTT, Rudolf Edlingerplatz 4 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1992/11] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14171 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 88905666.9 | 29.06.1988 | [1990/50] | WO1988DE00392 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000115 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401216 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401216 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
B41J2/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/50] | Title | German: | HEIZVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERWÄRMUNG DER TINTE IM SCHREIBKOPF EINER TINTENDRUCKEINRICHTUNG | [1990/50] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR WARMING UP THE INK IN THE WRITE HEAD OF AN INK PRINTING MACHINE | [1990/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE DE L'ENCRE DANS LA TETE D'ECRITURE D'UNE MACHINE D'IMPRESSION A L'ENCRE | [1990/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4567353 [ ] (AIBA MASAHIKO [JP]); | US4668965 [ ] (TANAKA YASUHIKO [JP], et al); | US4719472 [ ] (ARAKAWA JUNICHI [JP]) |