EP0368880 - A METHOD OF MOUNTING A TIGHT-FITTING TUBE SECTION OR SOCKET ON A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKT A/S NKT Allé 1 DK-2605 Broendby / DK | [1990/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Ole Kjaer Engvangsvej 8, Stroby Egede DK-4600 Koge / DK | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 88905746.9 | 15.07.1988 | [1990/21] | WO1988DK00123 | Priority number, date | DK19870003702 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: DK 370287 | [1990/21] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900782 | Date: | 26.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368880 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/00, H02G1/14, H01B17/58 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
H01R4/70 (EP);
H02G15/1826 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | MONTAGEVERFAHREN EINER GUTPASSENDEN ROHRSEKTION AUF EIN KABEL | [1990/21] | English: | A METHOD OF MOUNTING A TIGHT-FITTING TUBE SECTION OR SOCKET ON A CABLE | [1990/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE MONTAGE SUR UN CABLE D'UN TRON ON DE TUBE OU MANCHON BIEN AJUSTES | [1990/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1989 | Translation filed | 12.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/04] | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4653170 (KELSON ARNOLD A [US]); | [X]US1488901 (ARMSTRONG GEORGE M); | [A]DE2621641 (AMERACE CORP); | [A]DK150428B (NORDISKE KABEL TRAAD [DK]); | [A]US3515798 (SIEVERT JAMES A); | [A]US3946480 (DIENES ZOLTAN B); | [A]EP0117092 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0210807 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) |