EP0327616 - HUB FOR CYCLE WITH IDENTICAL FRONT AND REAR WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE GEPIROUES S.A.R.L. "La Fontaine", Nohan/Semois F-08800 Thilay / FR | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGET, Gilbert Tourteron F-08130 Attigny / FR | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Gérardin, Robert Jean René PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA 18 et 18bis, rue de Bellefond BP 328-09 75428 Paris Cèdex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Gérardin, Robert Jean René PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA 18 et 18bis, rue de Bellefond BP 328-09 F-75428 Paris Cèdex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88905901.0 | 04.07.1988 | [1989/33] | WO1988FR00357 | Priority number, date | FR19870010262 | 17.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8710262 | [1989/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900510 | Date: | 26.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327616 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/02 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
B60B27/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | RADNABE FÜR FAHRRAD MIT IDENTISCHEM VOR- UND HINTERRAD | [1989/33] | English: | HUB FOR CYCLE WITH IDENTICAL FRONT AND REAR WHEELS | [1989/33] | French: | MOYEU POUR CYCLE A ROUES AVANT ET ARRIERE IDENTIQUES | [1989/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/20] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/20] | Appeal following examination | 18.10.1991 | Appeal received No. T0089/93 | 27.11.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.12.1993 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1993/52] | 09.02.1994 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/07] | 16.05.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | BE435289 [ ]; | FR856601 [ ]; | GB2127113 [ ] (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | US3922018 [ ] (SHOOK WILLIAM B) | by applicant | BE334192 | BE344992 | FR1018113 | FR856601 | GB2127113 | US3922018 | BE435289 |