EP0326594 - AQUEOUS BORON-CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED STATES BORAX & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 3075 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles California 90010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states UNITED STATES BORAX & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 3075 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALOUF, George, M. 19 Elderberry Irvine, CA 92715 / US | 02 /
DOCKS, Edward, L. 5843 E. Teton Avenue Orange, CA 92667 / US | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1989/32] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88906578.5 | 29.06.1988 | [1989/32] | WO1988US02218 | Priority number, date | US19870069906 | 06.07.1987 Original published format: US 69906 | US19880155775 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: US 155775 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900154 | Date: | 12.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326594 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326594 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C05G3/02 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
C05G5/23 (EP,US);
Y10S71/903 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05G5/23, C05G3/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BOR ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1989/32] | English: | AQUEOUS BORON-CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS | [1989/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES CONTENANT DU BORE | [1989/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1989 | Search fee paid | 01.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.1994 | SE | 21.12.1994 | [1995/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1036785 (UNITED STATES BORAX CHEM); | [X]DE3536417 (DESOWAG BAYER HOLZSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP0242753 (WOLMAN GMBH DR [DE]) | International search | [A]US4119552 (DAVIS BRYAN TERENCE, et al) |