EP0364494 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR MAKING 90 K SUPERCONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCarron, Eugene, Michael, III 22 Boulderbrook Drive Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88906782.3 | 09.06.1988 | [1990/17] | WO1988US01881 | Priority number, date | US19870064459 | 22.06.1987 Original published format: US 64459 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8810237 | Date: | 29.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364494 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01G3/00, C04B35/00, H01L39/12 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C01G3/006 (EP,US);
C01F11/04 (KR);
H10N60/0268 (EP,US);
C04B35/4508 (EP,US);
C01P2002/76 (EP,US);
Y10S505/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/17] | C01F11/04, C01F17/00, C04B35/50, H01L39/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 90K-SUPRALEITERN | [1990/17] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR MAKING 90 K SUPERCONDUCTORS | [1990/17] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE FABRICATION DE SUPRACONDUCTEURS 90 K | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1989 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/21] | 01.01.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0281753 (IBM [US]) |