EP0378545 - TITANIUM ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND; Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERRY, Stephen 3 The Croft Fleet Hampshire GU14 8EG / GB | 02 /
RESTALL, James, Edward 24 Calvin Close Camberley Surrey GU15 1DN / GB | 03 /
WOOD, Michael, Ian Abbotts Cottage London Road Mickleham, Nr Dorking Surrey RH5 6EH / GB | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | ||
Former [1992/52] | Beckham, Robert William Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborogh Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | ||
Former [1990/30] | Beckham, Robert William Defence Evaluation and Research Agency Intellectual Property Department R69 Building DERA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88906954.8 | 28.07.1988 | [1990/30] | WO1988GB00624 | Priority number, date | GB19870018192 | 31.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8718192 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901052 | Date: | 09.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378545 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378545 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C22C14/00 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C22C14/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | TITANLEGIERUNGEN | [1990/30] | English: | TITANIUM ALLOYS | [1990/30] | French: | ALLIAGES DE TITANE | [1990/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3411901 [ ] (HEINRICH WINTER); | DE1533180 [ ] (WINTER DR HEINRICH); | FR2462484 [ ] (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) |