EP0368922 - SERVO-ASSISTED GEAR SELECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNEFFER, Franz Schusterstrasse 30 D-7996 Meckenbeuren / DE | [1990/21] | Application number, filing date | 88907056.1 | 30.06.1988 | [1990/21] | WO1988EP00578 | Priority number, date | DE19873724272 | 22.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724272 | [1990/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900515 | Date: | 26.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368922 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368922 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/22, F16H59/56 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
G05G1/46 (EP,US);
F16H59/56 (EP,US);
F16H63/40 (EP,US);
B60W2050/143 (EP,US);
B60W2540/14 (EP,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/21] | B60K41/22, F16H59/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/21] | Title | German: | HILFSKRAFTBETÄTIGTE GANGSCHALTEINRICHTUNG | [1990/21] | English: | SERVO-ASSISTED GEAR SELECTOR | [1990/21] | French: | SELECTEUR DE VITESSES A SERVOCOMMANDE | [1991/20] |
Former [1990/21] | SELECTEUR DE VITESSES SERVOCOMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4517646 (MAGNUSSON KARL G [SE], et al); | [A]EP0073280 (DEERE & CO [US]) |