EP0390919 - STEADY BRACE FOR ELONGATED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goda, Hidemitsu 2-20-9, Oimazato, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 537 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states GODA, Hidemitsu 2-20-9, Oimazato, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 537 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/41] | Patentanwälte TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88907800.2 | 05.09.1988 | [1990/41] | WO1988JP00896 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002622 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390919 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B13/02 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B23B13/126 (EP,US);
B23Q1/763 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2518 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNGSARM FÜR STABMATERIAL | [1990/41] | English: | STEADY BRACE FOR ELONGATED MATERIAL | [1990/41] | French: | BRAS DE RETENUE POUR ELEMENTS OBLONGS | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1990 | Translation filed | 28.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.1990 | Search fee paid | 28.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/13] | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1991 | 30.09.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - NO FURTHER RELEVANT DOCUMENTS HAVE BEEN RETRIEVED |